Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Emmanuel Kasanda Mulenga

Bishop of Mbujimayi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1954 Born
6 Aug 198126.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 199843.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mbujimayi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
14 Feb 199843.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Utimmira
14 Jun 199843.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utimmira
1 Aug 200954.6AppointedBishop of Mbujimayi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Bernard Emmanuel Kasanda Mulenga
Bishop Bernard Emmanuel Kasanda Mulenga (born ) Bishop of Mbujimayi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKananga
Ordained BishopOpen Air, le stade MIBA, Mbujimayi, Diocese of Mbujimayi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mbujimayi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Aug 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,337

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast