Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Aloysius (Alan) McGuckian, S.J.

Bishop of Raphoe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1953 Born
21 Oct 197219.6EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
22 Jun 198431.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Feb 199743.9ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
9 Jun 201764.2AppointedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
6 Aug 201764.4Ordained BishopBishop of Raphoe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Alexander Aloysius (Alan) McGuckian (VIAF: 315669061)
Bishop Alexander Aloysius (Alan) McGuckian S.J. (born ) Bishop of Raphoe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallymena, Co. Antrim
Ordained BishopSaints Eunan and Columba, Cathedral, Letterkenny, Co Donegal, Diocese of Raphoe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Raphoe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2017
  • ob: CB, 9 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Aug 2017