Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Joseph Tournier

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Carthage, Tunisia

Titular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1842Born
25 Mar 186623.2Ordained PriestPriest
26 Feb 189249.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Carthage, Tunisia
26 Feb 189249.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
5 Jun 189249.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
28 Jun 192481.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Carthage, Tunisia

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph Tournier
Bishop Jean-Joseph Tournier (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Carthage

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBonneville, Diocese of Annecy, France
Ordained BishopCarthage, Archdiocese of Carthage

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 308
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017