Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hippolyte Louis Bazin, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Sahara of French Sudan {Sahara nel Sudan Francese}

Titular Bishop of Tacia Montana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1857BornSaint-Aubin-du-Cormier, France
23 Sep 187922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
27 Jul 190144.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sahara of French Sudan {Sahara nel Sudan Francese}, Mali
27 Jul 190144.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
8 Sep 190144.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
30 Nov 191053.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Sahara of French Sudan {Sahara nel Sudan Francese}, Mali

MicroData Summary for Hippolyte Louis Bazin:
Bishop Hippolyte Louis Bazin M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Sahara of French Sudan {Sahara nel Sudan Francese}

  • a priest for 31.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 533
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013