Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-François Bordini, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1536¹Born
1 Sep 156428.6Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
25 Feb 159256.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cavaillon, France
27 Feb 159256.1AppointedBishop of Cavaillon, France
11 Mar 159862.1AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
Jan 1609³73.0DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-François Bordini (VIAF: 84080530)
Archbishop Jean-François Bordini C.O. (born 1536, died Jan 1609) Archbishop of Avignon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro in Vincoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 143, and Page 105
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 127, and Page 161
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Nov 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1592, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast