Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Riccardi

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Mar 1591AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
12 Mar 1591Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
16 May 1604DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Riccardi:
Bishop Alessandro Riccardi (died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 305
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 29, Number 138
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 324

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015