Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Corrionero

Deceased

Bishop of Catania


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Mar 1589AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
8 May 1589Ordained BishopBishop of Catania, Italy
9 Jul 1592DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Juan Corrionero:
Bishop Juan Corrionero (died ) Bishop of Catania

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 159
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio EspaŮol, Volume 1500, Page 102, Number 641

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 4 Dec 2013