Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ottavio Cardinal Bandini

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Fermo, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Prefect of the Congregation of Ecclesiastical Immunity


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1558Born
19 Jun 159536.6AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
25 Jun 159536.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
5 Jun 159637.6Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 159637.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
10 Apr 160647.4ResignedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
16 Sep 161556.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
27 Mar 162162.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
1622²63.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
16 Sep 162465.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
1626²67.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Ecclesiastical Immunity
7 Sep 162667.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
2 Jul 162768.6ResignedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
1 Aug 162970.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Fermo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Bandini (VIAF: 21518994)
Ottavio Cardinal Bandini (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Fermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopS. Silvestro al Quirinale, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Assunta Chapel, S. Silvestro al Quirinale, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 34.1 years
  • a cardinal for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1596
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 188
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 34, Number 171
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Aug 2018

Quantcast