Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marsilio Landriani

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1528¹Born
10 Nov 159365.8AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
14 Nov 159365.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
27 Aug 160981.6DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marsilio Landriani (VIAF: 259611081)
Bishop Marsilio Landriani (born 1528, died ) Bishop of Vigevano

EventPlace
Ordained BishopTranspontine, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 334
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 32, Number 159
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 369
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1593, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast