Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Odo Fusi Pecci

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Senigallia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1920Born
19 Dec 194222.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 197151.0AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
29 Aug 197151.1Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
21 Jan 199776.5RetiredBishop of Senigallia, Italy
20 Mar 201695.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Senigallia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Odo Fusi Pecci (VIAF: 237135086)
Bishop Odo Fusi Pecci (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Senigallia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCingoli

  • a priest for 73.2 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 20 Mar 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018