Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vladimír Filo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rožňava, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1940Born
25 Jul 196222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Trnava, Slovakia
17 Mar 199050.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trnava, Slovakia
17 Mar 199050.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca in Mauretania
16 Apr 199050.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thucca in Mauretania
23 Nov 200262.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
27 Dec 200868.9SucceededBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
28 Jan 200969.0InstalledBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
21 Mar 201575.1RetiredBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
18 Aug 201575.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Rožňava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Vladimír Filo
Bishop Vladimír Filo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rožňava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGán

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,869
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2015
  • d: CB, 20 Aug 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast