Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Torrijos y Gómez

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1841Born
1866¹24.3Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 188746.2AppointedBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
19 Aug 188846.9Ordained BishopBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
21 May 189452.7AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
16 Jan 190361.3DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Torrijos y Gómez
Bishop Ramón Torrijos y Gómez (born , died ) Bishop of Badajoz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCardenete, Diocese of Cuenca
Ordained BishopCuenca, Diocese of Cuenca

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 203, and Page 433
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017