Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan María Valero y Nacarino

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1835BornMalpartida
17 Dec 185924.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 May 187640.7SelectedBishop of Tui, Spain
26 Jun 187640.7ConfirmedBishop of Tui, Spain
12 Nov 187641.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tui, Spain
16 Dec 188146.2SelectedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
27 Mar 188246.5ConfirmedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
16 Nov 189055.1DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan María Valero y Nacarino:
Bishop Juan María Valero y Nacarino (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 220, and Page 571
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 46, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015