Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Rancés y Villanueva

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1842Born
23 Dec 186523.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 188644.2AppointedPrelate of Ciudad Real, Spain
10 Jun 188644.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
3 Oct 188644.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dora
28 Nov 189856.6AppointedBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain
14 Jun 191775.2DiedBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain

MicroData Summary for José María Rancés y Villanueva
Bishop José María Rancés y Villanueva (born , died ) Bishop of Cádiz y Ceuta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCádiz, Diocese of Cádiz y Ceuta
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cádiz, Diocese of Cádiz y Ceuta

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 250, and Page 280
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017