Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pascual Carrascosa y Gabaldón

Deceased

Bishop of Orense, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1847Born
21 Dec 187224.9Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 189547.9AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
19 Apr 189648.3Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
15 May 190456.3DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pascual Carrascosa y Gabaldón
Bishop Pascual Carrascosa y Gabaldón (born , died ) Bishop of Orense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuintanar del Rey, Diocese of Cuenca
Ordained BishopS. Barbara, Madrid

  • a priest for 31.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 134
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 74
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017