Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simon-Victor Tonyé Bakot

Archbishop Emeritus of Yaoundé, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1947 Born
15 Jul 197326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Douala, Cameroon
26 Jan 198739.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Douala, Cameroon
26 Jan 198739.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Siminina
26 Apr 198740.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Siminina
22 Mar 199345.9AppointedBishop of Edéa, Cameroon
18 Oct 200356.5AppointedArchbishop of Yaoundé, Cameroon
29 Jul 201366.3ResignedArchbishop of Yaoundé, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Simon-Victor Tonyé Bakot
Archbishop Simon-Victor Tonyé Bakot (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Yaoundé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEséka

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Yaoundé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast