Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sosthène Léopold Bayemi Matjei

Bishop of Obala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1964 BornMatomb
12 Feb 199429.1Ordained PriestPriest of Eséka, Cameroon
3 Dec 200944.9AppointedBishop of Obala, Cameroon
2 Feb 201045.1Ordained BishopBishop of Obala, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Sosthène Léopold Bayemi Matjei:
Bishop Sosthène Léopold Bayemi Matjei (born ) Bishop of Obala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Obala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,565

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013