Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adriano Tessarollo

Bishop of Chioggia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1946 Born
6 Jun 197125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
28 Mar 200962.9AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
7 Jun 200963.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
11 Jun 200963.1InstalledBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Adriano Tessarollo
Bishop Adriano Tessarollo (born ) Bishop of Chioggia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTezze sul Brenta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chioggia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,186

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast