Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Antonio Castro Becerra

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Palmira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1908BornPalmira
23 Dec 193325.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Aug 194840.1AppointedBishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
31 Oct 194840.3Ordained BishopBishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
18 Dec 195244.5AppointedBishop of Palmira, Colombia
20 Aug 198375.2RetiredBishop of Palmira, Colombia
1 Apr 199182.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Palmira, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Jesús Antonio Castro Becerra:
Bishop Jesús Antonio Castro Becerra (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Palmira

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013