Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vilmos Batthyány

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nitra

Titular Archbishop of Cyrrhus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1870BornZala Szentgroth
7 Jul 189424.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 190231.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia
3 Jan 190231.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
5 Feb 190231.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
18 Mar 191141.0SucceededBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
16 Dec 192050.8RetiredBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
16 Dec 192050.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
24 Nov 192353.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Nitra, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Vilmos Batthyány:
Archbishop Vilmos Batthyány (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nitra

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013