Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of São Gabriel da Cachoeira

Dioecesis Cachoëirensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 21 October 1981
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Manaus
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Amazonas
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 286,866 (110,801 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte I
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 61, Av. 7 de Setembro 205, 69750-000 Sao Gabriel da Cachoeira, AM, Brazil
  • Telephone: (097)3471-1367
  • Fax: 3471-1287

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Rio Negro
Territorial Prelature of Rio Negro
1 May 1925ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Rio Negro Territorial Prelature of Rio Negro (erected)
Diocese of Rio Negro
30 October 1980ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Rio Negro Diocese of Rio Negro
Diocese of São Gabriel da Cachoeira
21 October 1981Name ChangedDiocese of Rio Negro Diocese of São Gabriel da Cachoeira

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Rio Negro
196525,00065,00038.5%25251,000263210ap1967
197046,000.0%1192003452ap1971
197627,00035,00077.1%23231,17334459ap1977
198021,60028,90074.7%242490033489ap1981
Diocese of Rio Negro
Diocese of São Gabriel da Cachoeira
199039,90045,00088.7%115162,49322439ap1991
199945,50055,00082.7%614202,27525349ap2000
200045,00055,00081.8%614202,25023419ap2001
200145,00055,00081.8%614202,25023379ap2002
200252,00055,00094.5%516212,476243710ap2003
200354,00060,00090.0%910192,842174610ap2004
200456,00062,00090.3%109192,947164110ap2005
201092,90094,60098.2%1010204,645204410ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 20 Nov 2012