Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Amezcua Melgoza

Bishop Emeritus of Colima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1938 BornPurépero
22 Dec 196224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Zamora, Michoacán, México
9 May 199557.0AppointedBishop of Campeche, México
21 Jun 199557.1Ordained BishopBishop of Campeche, México
9 Jun 200567.1AppointedBishop of Colima, México
11 Nov 201375.5RetiredBishop of Colima, México

MicroData Summary for José Luis Amezcua Melgoza:
Bishop José Luis Amezcua Melgoza (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Colima

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Colima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,567
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 11 Nov 2013