Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Albert Joseph Stevens, P.F.E.

Bishop Emeritus of Maroua-Mokolo

Note/Previous Titular See: (Piccoli Fratelli del Vangelo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1937 BornQuaregnon, Belgium
13 Jul 198043.3Ordained PriestPriest of Other
11 Nov 199457.6AppointedBishop of Maroua-Mokolo, Cameroon
15 Jan 199557.8Ordained BishopBishop of Maroua-Mokolo, Cameroon
5 Apr 201477.0RetiredBishop of Maroua-Mokolo, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Philippe Albert Joseph Stevens:
Bishop Philippe Albert Joseph Stevens P.F.E. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Maroua-Mokolo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maroua-Mokolo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,481
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Apr 2014