Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bruno Ateba Edo, S.A.C.

Bishop of Maroua-Mokolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1964 BornZoetelé
15 Aug 198924.7ProfessedMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
2 Oct 199429.9Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
8 Jul 199530.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
5 Apr 201449.4AppointedBishop of Maroua-Mokolo, Cameroon
17 May 201449.5Ordained BishopBishop of Maroua-Mokolo, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Bruno Ateba Edo:
Bishop Bruno Ateba Edo S.A.C. (born ) Bishop of Maroua-Mokolo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maroua-Mokolo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Apr 2014
  • ob: CB, 8 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Apr 2014