Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Joseph Byrne

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1872Born
8 Jun 189523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
19 Aug 192048.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
19 Aug 192048.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pegae
28 Oct 192048.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pegae
29 Aug 192149.3AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
29 Oct 192149.4InstalledArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
9 Feb 194067.7DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Edward Joseph Byrne
Archbishop Edward Joseph Byrne (born , died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast