Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Cantero Cuadrado

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1902BornCarrión de los Condes
22 Mar 192624.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 195149.8AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
27 Apr 195250.2Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
22 Oct 195351.7AppointedBishop of Huelva, Spain
20 May 196462.2AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
3 Jun 197775.3RetiredArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
19 Dec 197876.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Cantero Cuadrado:
Archbishop Pedro Cantero Cuadrado (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Zaragoza

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013