Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Vázquez Díaz, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia, Piaui, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1913Born
Dec 1925³12.0EnteredMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
23 Nov 192916.0Simple VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
8 Nov 193622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
8 Jul 195642.6AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Bom Jesus do Piauí, Piaui, Brazil
8 Jul 195642.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Usula
9 Sep 195642.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Usula
8 Mar 195844.3SucceededPrelate of Bom Jesus do Piauí, Piaui, Brazil
26 May 197864.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Usula
26 Oct 198167.9AppointedBishop of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia, Piaui, Brazil
1 Mar 198975.2RetiredBishop of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia, Piaui, Brazil
30 May 199884.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia, Piaui, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Vázquez Díaz
Bishop José Vázquez Díaz O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonforte de Lemos, Spain

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 79
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • c1/qodm: CB, 19 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast