Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Balanzá y Navarro

Deceased

Bishop of Lugo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1880BornValencia
27 Feb 190424.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Aug 192343.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
13 Aug 192343.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta
20 Jan 192444.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta
2 Mar 192848.1AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
28 Feb 193151.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mondoñedo, Spain
19 Jun 193555.4ResignedApostolic Administrator of Mondoñedo, Spain
29 Sep 196080.7DiedBishop of Lugo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rafael Balanzá y Navarro:
Bishop Rafael Balanzá y Navarro (born , died ) Bishop of Lugo

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013