Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ornelas Carvalho, S.C.I.

Bishop of Setúbal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1954 BornPorto da Cruz
29 Sep 197218.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
23 Sep 197723.7Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
9 Aug 198127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
27 May 200349.3AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
25 May 201561.3ResignedSuperior General of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
24 Aug 201561.6AppointedBishop of Setúbal, Portugal
25 Oct 201561.8Ordained BishopBishop of Setúbal, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Ornelas Carvalho:
Bishop José Ornelas Carvalho S.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Setúbal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Setúbal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Aug 2015
  • ob: CB, 24 Aug 2015
  • c2+: CB, 16 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015