Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andreas Peter Cornelius Sol, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amboina, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1915Born
21 Sep 193519.9ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
21 Sep 193822.9Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
10 Aug 194024.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
10 Dec 196348.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Amboina, Indonesia
10 Dec 196348.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Regiana
25 Feb 196448.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Regiana
15 Jan 196549.2SucceededBishop of Amboina, Indonesia
10 Jun 199478.6RetiredBishop of Amboina, Indonesia
26 Mar 2016100.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Amboina, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Andreas Peter Cornelius Sol (VIAF: 250963300)
Bishop Andreas Peter Cornelius Sol M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amboina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmsterdam-Sloten, Netherlands

  • a priest for 75.6 years
  • a bishop for 52.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d/sole/perp: CB, 26 Mar 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017