Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio da Encarnação, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1693¹Born
5 Feb 174552.0SelectedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
8 Mar 174552.1ConfirmedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
22 Jan 174754.0Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
22 Sep 175259.7DiedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio da Encarnação
Bishop Antonio da Encarnação O.S.A. (born 1693, died ) Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlinda

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 405
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017