Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wiesław Śpiewak, C. R.

Bishop of Hamilton in Bermuda, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1963 Born
15 Sep 198420.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Resurrection of Our Lord Jesus Christ
19 May 199026.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Resurrection of Our Lord Jesus Christ
13 Jun 201551.6AppointedBishop of Hamilton in Bermuda, Antilles
1 Oct 201551.9Ordained BishopBishop of Hamilton in Bermuda, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Wiesław Śpiewak
Bishop Wiesław Śpiewak C. R. (born ) Bishop of Hamilton in Bermuda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKraków, Poland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hamilton in Bermuda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2015
  • ob: CB, 13 Jun 2015
  • c34: CB, 1 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,583

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 May 2017