Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mark Andrew Hagemoen

Bishop of Mackenzie-Fort Smith, Northwest Territories


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1961 BornVancouver
12 May 199028.6Ordained PriestPriest of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
15 Oct 201352.1AppointedBishop of Mackenzie-Fort Smith, Northwest Territories, Canada
15 Dec 201352.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mackenzie-Fort Smith, Northwest Territories, Canada

MicroData Summary for Mark Andrew Hagemoen:
Bishop Mark Andrew Hagemoen (born ) Bishop of Mackenzie-Fort Smith

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mackenzie-Fort Smith.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 26 Nov 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2013, Number 162
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,995
  • mn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015