Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Darjeeling

Dioecesis Darieelingensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Stephen Lepcha, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 8 August 1962
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Calcutta
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 48,168 (18,604 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Darjiling-734101, West Bengal, India
  • Telephone: (0354)2254.027
  • Fax: 2254.929

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Sikkim
15 February 1929ErectedArchdiocese of Calcutta
Vicariate Apostolic of Tatsienlu
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Sikkim (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Sikkim
16 June 1931ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Sikkim Prefecture Apostolic of Sikkim
Diocese of Darjeeling
8 August 1962ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Sikkim Diocese of Darjeeling
14 June 1997Territory LostDiocese of Darjeeling Diocese of Bagdogra (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Sikkim
19501,617200,000.8%414188915187ap1951
Diocese of Darjeeling
197025,552796,6403.2%16809626627519419ap1971
198036,9312,450,0001.5%35579240110334ap1981
199054,4003,840,0001.4%535711049414529739ap1991
199931,3003,180,0001.0%675011726711430040ap2000
200030,6003,180,0001.0%604310329711826444ap2001
200133,7803,715,000.9%63451083128127249ap2002
200231,9433,530,542.9%675211926810729650ap2003
200331,9433,530,542.9%685212026610729650ap2004
200431,9423,600,000.9%615611727310222235ap2005
200633,5532,331,1531.4%55451003359031935ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Jul 2014