Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Lepcha

Bishop of Darjeeling


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1952 BornSuruk
15 Dec 198230.0Ordained PriestPriest of Darjeeling, India
14 Jun 199744.5AppointedBishop of Darjeeling, India
8 Dec 199745.0Ordained BishopBishop of Darjeeling, India

MicroData Summary for Stephen Lepcha:
Bishop Stephen Lepcha (born ) Bishop of Darjeeling

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Darjeeling.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013