Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso Silveira de Mello, S.J. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Diamantino, Mato Grosso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1901BornCruz Alta
6 Dec 193231.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Nov 194948.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Diamantino, Mato Grosso, Brazil
13 Jun 195554.3AppointedPrelate of Diamantino, Mato Grosso, Brazil
13 Jun 195554.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasai
21 Aug 195554.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nasai
29 Nov 197170.8ResignedPrelate of Diamantino, Mato Grosso, Brazil
29 Nov 197170.8ResignedTitular Bishop of Nasai
2 Oct 198786.6DiedPrelate Emeritus of Diamantino, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alonso Silveira de Mello:
Bishop Alonso Silveira de Mello S.J. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Diamantino

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015