Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Joseph Spratt

Deceased

Archbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1854Born
29 Jul 188228.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
17 Jul 191157.2AppointedArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
30 Nov 191157.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
23 Feb 193883.8DiedArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Spratt
Archbishop Michael Joseph Spratt (born , died ) Archbishop of Kingston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOps

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 96
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast