Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mihály Haas

Deceased

Bishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1810BornPinkafeld
3 Aug 183424.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Aug 183424.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 185848.5AppointedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
13 Feb 185948.8Ordained BishopBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
27 Mar 186656.0DiedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Mihály Haas:
Bishop Mihály Haas (born , died ) Bishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 532

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013