Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emerik Osegovich Barlabassevecz

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1775³BornVinarec
19 Apr 180125.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 May 180125.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 183358.2SelectedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
23 Jun 183458.7ConfirmedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
17 Aug 183458.8Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
8 Jan 186993.2DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emerik Osegovich Barlabassevecz (VIAF: 24074262)
Bishop Emerik Osegovich Barlabassevecz (born , died ) Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

  • a priest for 67.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 340
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Aug 2016