Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Eliseu Zuqueto, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas, Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1928BornResplendor
19 Mar 195526.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Mar 198051.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil
14 Mar 198051.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tela
8 Jun 198052.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tela
18 Apr 198354.9AppointedBishop of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas, Bahia, Brazil
15 Jun 200577.1RetiredBishop of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas, Bahia, Brazil
23 Aug 201688.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Eliseu Zuqueto
Bishop Antônio Eliseu Zuqueto O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 23 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Aug 2016