Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Rafael Barquero Arce

Bishop Emeritus of Alajuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1931 BornSan Rafael de Heredia
22 Dec 195625.1Ordained PriestPriest of Alajuela, Costa Rica
28 Mar 197947.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica
28 Mar 197947.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Arindela
1 May 197947.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arindela
22 Dec 198049.1AppointedBishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica
3 Jul 200775.6RetiredBishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for José Rafael Barquero Arce:
Bishop José Rafael Barquero Arce (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Alajuela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alajuela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015