Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Enrique Montero Umaña, O.F.M. Conv.

Bishop of San Isidro de El General


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1945 BornMoravia
2 Feb 196519.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
24 Feb 197226.2Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
16 Aug 197327.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
24 Dec 201368.1AppointedBishop of San Isidro de El General, Costa Rica
1 Mar 201468.3Ordained BishopBishop of San Isidro de El General, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Enrique Montero Umaña:
Bishop Gabriel Enrique Montero Umaña O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Bishop of San Isidro de El General

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Isidro de El General.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2013
  • ob: CB, 8 Jan 2014
  • c2: CB, 26 Feb 2014
  • c34: CB, 1 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 23 Apr 2015