Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Alajuela

Dioecesis Alaiuelensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
16 February 1921ErectedDiocese of San José de Costa Rica Diocese of Alajuela (erected)
19 August 1954Territory LostDiocese of Alajuela
Archdiocese of San José de Costa Rica
Diocese of San Isidro de El General (erected)
22 July 1961Territory LostDiocese of Alajuela Diocese of Tilarán (erected)
25 July 1995Territory LostDiocese of Alajuela
Diocese of Tilarán
Diocese of Ciudad Quesada (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1948298,160808,13836.9%2916456,625182128ap1951
1959390,874398,37498.1%3617537,374178228ap1960
1966258,307267,34796.6%5224763,398278328ap1967
1970307,778324,48794.9%4915644,809166729ap1971
1976356,108378,84094.0%5615715,015268234ap1977
1980376,000393,00095.7%5522774,8833210837ap1981
1990416,000470,00088.5%71361073,8874310342ap1991
1999343,000400,00085.8%6920893,8531278030ap2000
2000391,742435,26990.0%7420944,1671278030ap2001
2001554,000604,00091.7%7420945,8931278030ap2002
2002562,000610,00092.1%7420945,9781278730ap2003
2003522,750618,00084.6%81201015,1751288730ap2004
2004529,399623,94484.8%85201055,0411278431ap2005
2006551,100662,52083.2%83181015,4561236031ap2007
2012468,438678,89669.0%94181124,182327834ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013