Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Ablondi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Livorno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1924BornMilano
31 May 194722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ventimiglia, Italy
9 Aug 196641.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Livorno, Italy
9 Aug 196641.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Mulli
1 Oct 196641.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mulli
7 Sep 197045.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Livorno, Italy
26 Sep 197045.8SucceededBishop of Livorno, Italy
9 Dec 200076.0RetiredBishop of Livorno, Italy
21 Aug 201085.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Livorno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alberto Ablondi:
Bishop Alberto Ablondi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Livorno

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 43.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ab/coad/livo: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 62, Page 643
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013