Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Santander y Frutos

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

Titular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1835Born
1859¹23.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 188751.7AppointedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
30 Oct 188752.3Ordained BishopBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
6 Jan 188852.5InstalledBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
24 Nov 1899³64.3ResignedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
24 Feb 190064.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
14 Feb 190771.6DiedBishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Santander y Frutos (VIAF: 49037427)
Bishop Manuel Santander y Frutos (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRueda, Archdiocese of Valladolid, Spain
Ordained BishopAssumption, Rueda, Archdiocese of Valladolid, Spain

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 202, and Page 508
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017