Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto María Cervera y Cervera

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca y Ibiza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1827BornPedralva
1850¹22.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 188053.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza, Spain
16 Dec 188053.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hypsus
6 Feb 188153.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hypsus
16 Dec 188154.2SelectedBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
27 Mar 188254.5ConfirmedBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
21 Jul 188557.8ResignedBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
10 Jun 188658.7AppointedBishop of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain
14 Nov 189770.1DiedBishop of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacinto María Cervera y Cervera:
Bishop Jacinto María Cervera y Cervera (born , died ) Bishop of Mallorca y Ibiza

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 203, and Page 312
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 360

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013