Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Shinyanga

Dioecesis Shinyangaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 9 August 1956
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Mwanza
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Tanzania, United Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 30,000 (11,587 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 47, Shinyanga, Tanzania
  • Telephone: (028)276.30.40
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Maswa
24 June 1950SplitVicariate Apostolic of Musoma-Maswa Prefecture Apostolic of Musoma
Vicariate Apostolic of Maswa
Diocese of Maswa
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Maswa Diocese of Maswa
Diocese of Shinyanga
9 August 1956Name ChangedDiocese of Maswa Diocese of Shinyanga

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Maswa
19502,7331010273ap1951
Diocese of Maswa
Diocese of Shinyanga
197043,972741,9455.9%532371,188371820ap1971
198071,7741,260,9805.7%622282,563242723ap1981
1990113,5021,694,3376.7%1221333,439243823ap1991
1999185,3902,127,7908.7%2821493,783235125ap2000
2000190,4422,197,7908.7%2922513,734265125ap2001
2001209,6382,350,0008.9%2822504,192275925ap2002
2002235,3902,247,00010.5%3118494,803204426ap2003
2003245,4802,267,27110.8%3116475,222184426ap2004
2004284,5902,001,89314.2%2914436,618164125ap2005
2010696,0002,280,00030.5%40195911,796195026ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 6 Nov 2012