Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gilla Vincenzo Gremigni, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Novara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1891Born
27 Jun 191524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
18 Jan 194553.9AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
11 Feb 194554.0Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
29 Jun 195160.4AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
17 Apr 195867.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Novara, Italy
7 Jan 196371.9DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gilla Vincenzo Gremigni
Archbishop Gilla Vincenzo Gremigni M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastagneto Carducci

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1945, Number 4
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 712, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast