Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Siprianus Hormat

Bishop of Ruteng, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1965 Born
8 Oct 199530.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ruteng, Indonesia
13 Nov 201954.3AppointedBishop of Ruteng, Indonesia
19 Mar 202054.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ruteng, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Siprianus Hormat
Bishop Siprianus Hormat (born ) Bishop of Ruteng

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCibal, Diocese of Ruteng
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ruteng, Diocese of Ruteng

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ruteng.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2019
  • ob: CB, 18 Nov 2019
  • c2+: CB, 5 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast