Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Francis Doerfler

Bishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1964 Born
13 Jul 199126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
17 Dec 201349.1AppointedBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA
11 Feb 201449.2Ordained BishopBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for John Francis Doerfler
Bishop John Francis Doerfler (born ) Bishop of Marquette

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAppleton, WI

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Marquette.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Dec 2013
  • ob: CB, 17 Dec 2013
  • c2+: CB, 16 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,097

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018